This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2021 at 09:17:56 (UTC).

MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ ET AL VS CRAIG TRIANCE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against CRAIG TRIANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6752

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

TEJON BUILDERS INC

RODRIGUEZ MIGUEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

TRIANCE CRAIG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KAMRAN M.H. TONY ESQ.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Non-Jury Trial ((1-2 day estimate)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:35 AM in Department 34; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (1-2 day estimate); Order to Show Cause Re: Di...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial (1-2 day estimate); Order to Show Cause Re: Di...) of 01/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 01/23/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 34; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); TEJON BUILDERS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 34; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-01-19 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); TEJON BUILDERS, INC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR LEGAL MALPRACTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less