This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2019 at 00:12:53 (UTC).

MIGUEL RASCON, ET AL. VS ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 MIGUEL RASCON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6393

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RASCON MIGUEL

RASCON NIEVES

Defendants

ROEM DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

14348 RAMONA LLC

ROEM BUILDERS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCCANDLESS TIMOTHY LEE

MCCANDLESS TIMOTHY L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/28/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/28/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/28/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/28/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...) OF 06/25/2019

6/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...) OF 06/25/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...)

6/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANC...)

7/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANC...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CAS...) OF 09/25/2019

9/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CAS...) OF 09/25/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • Hearing10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Hearing10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Hearing10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Cas...) of 09/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions in the Amount of $150.00 Should not be Imposed for Plaintiff's Counsel's Failure to Appear on June 25, 2019) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE CA...) of 06/25/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Rascon (Plaintiff); Nieves Rascon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Rascon (Plaintiff); Nieves Rascon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roem Development Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Roem Builders, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCANDLESS TIMOTHY LEE