This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 00:26:09 (UTC).

MIGUEL LICEA VS FOSSIL GROUP, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 MIGUEL LICEA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against FOSSIL GROUP, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0942

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LICEA MIGUEL

Defendant

FOSSIL GROUP INC. DBA FOSSIL.COM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KNOWLES VICTORIA CAMPBELL

FERRELL SCOTT J.

Defendant Attorney

SHERIDAN STEPHANIE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT - ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

9/7/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - COMPLAINT - ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/30/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

7/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

5/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE:)

Substitution of Attorney

5/17/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

5/4/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/2/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/18/2023: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/21/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/19/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/17/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/17/2023: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/07/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Miguel Licea on 01/17/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Miguel Licea as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal without prejudice - complaint - entire action of all parties and all causes of action; Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal without prejudice - complaint - entire action of all parties and all causes of action: Filed By: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 09/07/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant) to Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why this court should not impose sanctions against defendant's attorney for failure to appear at the Case Management Conference of July 11, 2023 scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/07/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: why this court should not impose sanctions against defendant's attorney for failure to appear at the Case Management Conference of July 11, 2023 scheduled for 09/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 47 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/13/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference:)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
01/19/2023

DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Fossil Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) to Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Fossil Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant) to Fossil Group, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Fossil Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Theresa M. Traber in Department 47 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Fossil Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miguel Licea (Plaintiff); As to: Fossil Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less