Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/23/2021 at 09:53:19 (UTC).

MIGUEL HERNANDEZ VS ARMANDO CERVANTES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 MIGUEL HERNANDEZ filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ARMANDO CERVANTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2978

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ MIGUEL

Defendants

CERVANTES ARMANDO

CERVANTES ORALIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

SHAFER ROGER

Other Attorneys

ECKS DOUG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/16/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

12/11/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Hearing10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Miguel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Armando Cervantes (Defendant); Oralia Cervantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Armando Cervantes (Defendant); Oralia Cervantes (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less