This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2021 at 06:04:25 (UTC).

MIGUEL DAVILA, ET AL. VS HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 MIGUEL DAVILA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9490

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SERRANO GLORIA ALICIA

RODRIGUEZ SANTIAGO

ORDONEZ HIDALGO OSCAR M.

GALLEGOS PASCUAL

DAVILA MIGUEL

VEGA SALVADOR

OLVERA MARIA ROSARIO

OLVERA MARIA

SERRANO GLORIA

VILLALTA OSCAR

CASTILLO GUADALUPE

ORDONEZ OSCAR

Defendants

SOCIAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HOLLANDER CUSHION

SOCIAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS

HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/18/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

4/26/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - OSCAR M. ORDONEZ HIDALGO IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT]

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - OSCAR M. ORDONEZ HIDALGO IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT]

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT]

Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - SANTIAGO RODRIGUEZ IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT

Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - OSCAR M. ORDONEZ HIDALGO IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - CLERK'S APPLICATION TO VACATE AND ORDER - OSCAR M. ORDONEZ HIDALGO IS STRICKEN FROM THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/10/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/11/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/11/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3/11/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MIGUEL DAVILA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by MIGUEL DAVILA (Plaintiff); SALVADOR VEGA (Plaintiff); PASCUAL GALLEGOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - Santiago Rodriguez is stricken from the Complaint]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Clerk's Application to Vacate and Order - Oscar M. Ordonez Hidalgo is stricken from the Complaint]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketClerk's Application to Vacate and Order (- Oscar M. Ordonez Hidalgo is stricken from the Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketClerk's Application to Vacate and Order (- Santiago Rodriguez is stricken from the Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MIGUEL DAVILA (Plaintiff); SALVADOR VEGA (Plaintiff); PASCUAL GALLEGOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint (- Santiago Rodriguez and Oscar M. Ordonez Hidalgo are stricken from the Complaint); Filed by MIGUEL DAVILA (Plaintiff); SALVADOR VEGA (Plaintiff); PASCUAL GALLEGOS (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOCAL INDUSTRIAL PARTNERS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HAGER PACIFIC PROPERTIES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O