This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 06:10:09 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL ORTIZ, ET AL. VS OK LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 MIGUEL ANGEL ORTIZ, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OK LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1210

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ORTIZ MARIA

ORTIZ MIGUEL ANGEL

ORTIZ SABRINA

ORTIZ STEPHANIE

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

OK LLC

Cross Defendant

GOLDEN PALMS OWNERS ASSOCIATION AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASIDI JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

ETTINGER HOWARD J

Cross Defendant Attorney

DEENIHAN MATTHEW J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

5/18/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

5/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/16/2023: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

5/16/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

4/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/10/2023: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

4/6/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Brief - BRIEF JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF

1/19/2023: Brief - BRIEF JOINT INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE BRIEF

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (SO) ADDITIONAL

1/3/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (SO) ADDITIONAL

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/3/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (SAB. O) ADDITIONAL

1/3/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (SAB. O) ADDITIONAL

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (MAO) ADDITIONAL

1/3/2023: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (MAO) ADDITIONAL

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A ASIDI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP2016.080

12/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A ASIDI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO CCP2016.080

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Demand for Jury Trial

12/20/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Case Management Statement

12/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/2/2022: Case Management Statement

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Golden Palms Owners Association, an unknown entity (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/06/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Miguel Angel Ortiz, et al. on 08/23/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Miguel Angel Ortiz, Sabrina Ortiz, Maria Ortiz, and Stephanie Ortiz as to OK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Cannot Dismiss Entire Case without the Xcomplainant's signature on the Request for Dismissal - Rejected; Submitted by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Miguel Angel Ortiz, et al. on 08/23/2022, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Miguel Angel Ortiz, Sabrina Ortiz, Maria Ortiz, and Stephanie Ortiz as to OK LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: OK LLC and DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: OK LLC and DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff); Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff); Maria Ortiz (Plaintiff); Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff); As to: OK LLC and DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive, (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Stephanie Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Sabrina Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Miguel Angel Ortiz (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less