This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 07:21:35 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL MARTINEZ VS WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 MIGUEL ANGEL MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9791

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendants

WEST CENTRAL FOOD LLC

WCP SERVICES INC.

WEST CENTRAL PRODUCE INC. DBA OM NOM

INVO PEO INC. III

DISTRICT MARKET LLC

LCF WCP SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorneys

KAMPE III KURT

FENNESSEY REX P.

MARCHELWSKI THERESA M

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/5/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Ruling

12/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Personal Service

12/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMVEL SETYAN IN ANTICIPATION OF THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

12/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SAMVEL SETYAN IN ANTICIPATION OF THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE)

Answer

10/28/2020: Answer

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF REX P. FENNESSEY

10/20/2020: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF REX P. FENNESSEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

10/21/2020: Case Management Order

Notice of Ruling

10/26/2020: Notice of Ruling

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to Defendant WCP Services, Inc.) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as t...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff); Invo Peo, Inc. III (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Invo Peo, Inc. III (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Angel Martinez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******9791    Hearing Date: November 16, 2020    Dept: 24

Rex P. Fennessey’s application to be admitted as counsel pro hac vice for Defendant Invo Peo, Inc. III is GRANTED.

On June 29, 2017, Plaintiff Miguel Angel Martinez brought the instant employment discrimination suit against her former employer Defendant West Central Produce Inc., WCP Services Inc., Invo Peo, Inc. III., LCF WCP Services Inc., District Market LLC, and West Central Food LLC.

On October 20, 2020, Rex P. Fennessey filed the instant application to appear as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Invo Peo III, Inc. No opposition was submitted.

Discussion

CRC Rule 9.40 provides that an attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction may apply to appear pro hac vice in this State by way of written application upon due notice to all interested parties, as well as service on the State Bar in San Francisco with payment of a $50.00 fee, so long as that attorney is not a resident of California, does not work in California and does not perform regular or substantial business, professional or other activities in the State.

The written application must provide the following information: (1) applicant attorney’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant attorney has been admitted and dates of admission; (3) a representation that the attorney applicant is a member in good standing in the courts of admission and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (4) the title of each court and action in which the applicant attorney has appeared pro hac vice in this State in the preceding two years, if any; and (5) the name, address, and telephone number of the active California State Bar member who is counsel of record in the local action. (CRC Rule 9.40(d).)

The application satisfies rule 9.40. The declarations supplied sufficient information to satisfy the requirements. (Fennessey Decl., ¶¶ 1-8.) Accordingly, the application is GRANTED. Moving party is ordered to give notice.