This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2020 at 01:51:55 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL DE LA ROSA VS EDGAR PINA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2018 MIGUEL ANGEL DE LA ROSA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDGAR PINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9746

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

DE LA ROSA MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

JOHN DANTUMA MASONRY INC.

PINA EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YE JOHN C. ESQ.

CHO PETER MUNKI ESQ.

GENSON EUGENE M.

GENSON EUGENE MARVIN ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SETCHELL JOHN L. ESQ.

SETCHELL JOHN LUKE ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/12/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

4/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/23/2020

4/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COVID-19;) OF 04/23/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE; SETTING OF A HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOT...) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE; SETTING OF A HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOT...) OF 04/28/2020

Notice of Ruling

2/19/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION , FIOLED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN...)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION , FIOLED BY PLAINTIFF, FOR AN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCU...)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCU...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT, EDGAR PINA

1/22/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT, EDGAR PINA

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT EDGAR PINAL

1/22/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANT EDGAR PINAL

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT EDGAR PINA

1/22/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT EDGAR PINA

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEPOSITIO...)

1/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO COMPEL DEPOSITIO...)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/9/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

4/27/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

4/27/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

3/29/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

3/29/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Miguel Angel De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE); Filed by Miguel Angel De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docketat 11:06 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re; Setting of a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Mot...) of 04/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re; Setting of a Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Mot...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: COVID-19;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: COVID-19;) of 04/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edgar Pina (Defendant); John Dantuma Masonry Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Edgar Pina (Defendant); John Dantuma Masonry Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Miguel Angel De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Miguel Angel De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Angel De La Rosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC699746    Hearing Date: February 14, 2020    Dept: 29

De La Rosa v. Pina et al.

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendant Edgar Pina is GRANTED. Mr. Pina is ordered to appear for his deposition at a time and place duly noticed by Plaintiff. The Court imposes sanctions against Defendant Edgar Pina in the amount of $1023.50, payable within 30 days.

On November 6, 2019, Plaintiff served Defendant Edgar Pina with a notice to depose Defendant. (Motion, Ex. 1.) The deposition was noticed for December 10, 2019. (Id.) Defendant did not object to the notice. On the date of the deposition, Defendant failed to appear but his counsel was present. (Motion, Ex. 2.) On January 2, 10, and 14, 2020, Plaintiff’s counsel emailed Defendant’s counsel in an attempt to resolve the deposition issue. (Genson Decl., ¶ 7-9; Ex. 3, 4, and 6.) On January 10, 2020, Defendant’s counsel responded that he is “working on providing [Plaintiff’s counsel] dates asap.” (Motion, Ex. 5.) However, to date, Defendant’s counsel has not provided any new dates for deposition or any reasons for failing to do so. (Motion, ¶ 5.)

The Court finds that Defendant’s deposition was properly noticed, and that Defendant failed to appear without a valid objection. Therefore, Plaintiff’s motion to compel Defendant’s attendance is granted

The Court finds that sanctions are warranted pursuant to CCP § 2025.450(g)(1). The Court imposes sanctions on Edgar Pina in the amount of $1023.50. The Court declines to impose sanctions on counsel since counsel was present on the date for which the deposition was scheduled.

The Moving party is ordered to give notice.