This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 20:25:13 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL CLARA VS PLAZA WEST COVINA, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2022 MIGUEL ANGEL CLARA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PLAZA WEST COVINA, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0939

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARA MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendants

PLAZA WEST COVINA

PLAZA WEST COVINA LP

PLAZA WEST COVINA MANAGEMENT PR LLC

STARWOOD RETAIL PARTNERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAMPTON ARTHUR

Defendant Attorney

KENNEDY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

1/10/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/10/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Demand for Jury Trial

1/11/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/17/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/17/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2025
  • Hearing01/06/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Plaza West Covina, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Plaza West Covina, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Angel Clara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Miguel Angel Clara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Angel Clara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Angel Clara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLAZA WEST COVINA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY JOHN