Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/30/2020 at 02:54:04 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL CASILLAS-GARCIA VS SEAN WESLEY WELLS

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 MIGUEL ANGEL CASILLAS-GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEAN WESLEY WELLS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0942

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASILLAS-GARCIA MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendant

WELLS SEAN WESLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PEREZ RICARDO ANTONIO

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

3/24/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Angel Casillas-Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Angel Casillas-Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ricardo Antonio Perez