Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 13:30:42 (UTC).

MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN VS PHARMAVITE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2019 MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PHARMAVITE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3545

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BELTRAN MIGUEL ANGEL

Defendants

PHARMAVITE LLC

PINEDA FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE

2/4/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE

Request for Dismissal

2/4/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

9/24/2019: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) RE MALCOLM H. MACKEY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2019

9/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/26/2019

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

9/26/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/20/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (OF PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE); Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:53 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (RE Malcolm H. Mackey); Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MIGUEL ANGEL BELTRAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PHARMAVITE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EBRAHIMIAN N. NICK ESQ.