This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 20:17:15 (UTC).

MIGUEL ALCALA VS JONATHAN ZABASAJJA

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 MIGUEL ALCALA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JONATHAN ZABASAJJA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0768

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCALA MIGUEL

Defendant

ZABASAJJA JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA

ZEESMAN DIANA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

9/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

9/7/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2024
  • Hearing08/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Hearing02/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Alcala (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA