This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2022 at 18:17:41 (UTC).

MIGUEL ALBERTO AVILA MORENO VS KEURIG DR. PEPPER, INC., A FOREIGN CORPORATION REGISTERED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 MIGUEL ALBERTO AVILA MORENO filed an Other lawsuit against KEURIG DR PEPPER, INC , A FOREIGN CORPORATION REGISTERED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4464

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVILA MORENO MIGUEL ALBERTO

Defendant

KEURIG DR. PEPPER INC. A FOREIGN CORPORATION REGISTERED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOK DEVIN

Defendant Attorney

DARROW TANJA L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/6/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/6/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/6/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT

12/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING OF DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

4/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

5/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/26/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 07/19/2022

7/19/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT) OF 07/19/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/16/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • Hearing07/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default and Default Judgment) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default and Default Judgment) of 07/19/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by MOTTS LLP Erroneously Sued As Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., a Foreign Corporation registered to do business in the State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MOTTS LLP Erroneously Sued As Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., a Foreign Corporation registered to do business in the State of California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Filing of Discrimination Complaint); Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Miguel Alberto Avila Moreno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE