This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2021 at 18:20:35 (UTC).

MIDSANEN LLOYD VS S ORANGE GROVE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 MIDSANEN LLOYD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against S ORANGE GROVE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0677

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LLOYD MIDSANEN

Defendants

S ORANGE GROVE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MILLER AND DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH WIND

Defendant Attorney

ABESADZE VANO

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/2/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/14/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

10/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/7/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/7/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/7/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by S Orange Grove LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Hearing); Filed by Midsanen Lloyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by S Orange Grove LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Miller and Desatnik Management Co, Inc, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by S Orange Grove LLC, A California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Miller and Desatnik Management Co, Inc, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Midsanen Lloyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Midsanen Lloyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Midsanen Lloyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Midsanen Lloyd (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILLER & DESATNIK MANAGEMENT CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH WIND