This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 10:06:20 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS VALLEY GUYS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VALLEY GUYS, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0436

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

VALLEY GUYS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA DOG HAUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HETTENA ALEXANDER V

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/15/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

7/22/2022: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2023
  • Hearing01/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit (OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE); Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HETTENA ALEXANDER V