This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 02:20:37 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY VS FRANCISCO MOSCO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCISCO MOSCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0505

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

A & A FIRE INC. A CORPORATION

MOSCO FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GABA RODOLFO JR

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/18/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A14 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mid-Century Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GABA RODOLFO