This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2022 at 06:48:32 (UTC).

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/21/2021 MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0687

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SELLER JANICE M. ESQ.

DAVIDIAN LINA S.

Defendant Attorneys

VON ESCH ROBERT A

VONESCH ROBERT ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/24/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

10/26/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

10/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Proof of Personal Service

10/4/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

1/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/11/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

2/14/2022: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES

Notice of Related Case

2/1/2022: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/30/2022: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and Order to File Cross-Complaint; Filed by BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketJoint Stipulation and Order to Consolidate Cases; Filed by BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Blusky Restoration Contractors, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference and Order to Show Cause Hearing); Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by State Farm General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY, a California Interinsurance Exchange (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUSKY RESTORATION CONTRACTORS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MID-CENTURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELLER JANICE M.