This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2020 at 06:06:36 (UTC).

MICRO QUALITY LABS, INC. VS VIRGIN SCENT, INC., A CORPORATION AND DOING BUSINESS AS ART NATURALS

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 MICRO QUALITY LABS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIRGIN SCENT, INC , A CORPORATION AND DOING BUSINESS AS ART NATURALS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0465

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICRO QUALITY LABS INC.

Defendant

VIRGIN SCENT INC. A CORPORATION AND DOING BUSINESS AS ART NATURALS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEAVNEY RICHARD PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

KAUFMAN ARYEH

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

9/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/15/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer - DEFENDANT VIRGIN SCENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MICRO QUALITY LABS, INC.

7/16/2019: Answer - DEFENDANT VIRGIN SCENT, INC.'S ANSWER TO THE UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT OF MICRO QUALITY LABS, INC.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/28/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

5/28/2019: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/28/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/28/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • Hearing07/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • Hearing07/22/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Hearing02/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request for Entry of Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Micro Quality Labs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketDefendant Virgin Scent, Inc.'s Answer to the Unverified Complaint of Micro Quality Labs, Inc.; Filed by VIRGIN SCENT, INC., a corporation and doing business as ART NATURALS (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Micro Quality Labs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Micro Quality Labs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Micro Quality Labs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Micro Quality Labs, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIRGIN SCENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEAVNEY RICHARD PATRICK