This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2023 at 14:29:30 (UTC).

MICRO ART, INC. VS OREN GOLD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 MICRO ART, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OREN GOLD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0407

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICRO ART INC.

Defendants

GOLD AESTHETIC INC.

GOLD NATALY

GOLD OREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERRERA ALEJANDRO H. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY M. LAURIE

STEMPLE JESSICA M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

12/12/2022: Order - TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER

Case Management Statement

11/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/29/2022: Answer

Order - ORDER RE DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

7/26/2022: Order - ORDER RE DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

7/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

Notice of Ruling

8/1/2022: Notice of Ruling

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

8/15/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

10/6/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/9/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

11/9/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

11/10/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Case Management Statement

11/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/20/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2024
  • Hearing05/22/2024 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2024
  • Hearing05/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Micro Art, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 12/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Preparation Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketJury Trial (5 days) scheduled for 05/22/2024 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 updated: Result Date to 12/12/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDeclaration SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT; Filed by: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration RE: INABILITY TO COMPLY WITH MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT; Filed by: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Alejandro H. Herrera, Esq. (Attorney): Organization Name: Herrera Clifton Hess

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Micro Art, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Micro Art, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Micro Art, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Oren Gold (Defendant); Nataly Gold (Defendant); Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******0407 Hearing Date: July 26, 2022 Dept: 53

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles – Central District

Department 53

micro art, inc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

oren gold , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

*******0407

Hearing Date:

July 26, 2022

Time:

10:00 a.m.

[Tentative] Order RE:

(1) demurrer TO COMPLAINT

(2) motion to strike portions of complaint

MOVING PARTIES: Defendants Oren Gold, Nataly Gold, and Gold Aesthetic, Inc.

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff Micro Art, Inc.

(1) Demurrer to Complaint

MOVING PARTIES: Defendants Oren Gold, Nataly Gold, and Gold Aesthetic, Inc.

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff Micro Art, Inc.

(2) Motion to Strike Portions of Complaint

The court considered the moving, opposition, and reply papers filed in connection with the demurrer and motion to strike.

BACKGROUND

Plaintiff Micro Art, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against defendants Oren Gold (“Oren”), Nataly Gold (“Nataly”), and Gold Aesthetic, Inc. (“Gold Aesthetic”) (collectively, “Defendants”), on August 17, 2021, asserting six causes of action for (1) intentional misrepresentation, (2) unfair business practices, (3) breach of contract, (4) intentional interference with prospective business advantage, (5) interference with contract, and (6) nuisance.

Defendants demur to Plaintiff’s first through sixth causes of action and move to strike Plaintiff’s claims for punitive damages, attorney’s fees, restitution, and injunctive relief.

DEMURRER

The court sustains Nataly and Oren’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s Complaint because it fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against Nataly and Oren since Plaintiff has not alleged (1) that Plaintiff entered into the lease with Nataly and Oren, instead alleging that Plaintiff entered into the lease with Gold Aesthetic (Compl., 9), or (2) that Nataly and Oren are the landlords of the property in light of the allegation that Plaintiff executed the subject lease with Gold Aesthetic. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e).) Plaintiff makes no specific reference to Nataly and Oren, instead referring to landlord-defendants, and therefore has failed to sufficiently allege a basis for their liability. The court notes that Plaintiff, in its opposition, has argued that the alter ego doctrine may impose liability on Nataly and Oren. However, Plaintiff has not alleged facts to support liability under the alter ego doctrine in its Complaint.

The court sustains Defendants’ demurrer to Plaintiff’s first cause of action for intentional misrepresentation because it fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action since it fails to allege every element of the cause of action for intentional misrepresentation with the specificity required by California law (and particularly “where, to whom, and by what means” each of the representations was made). (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e); Stansfield v. Starkey (1990) 220 Cal.App.3d 59, 73.)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s second cause of action for violation of California’s unfair competition law on the ground that it fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action since the only fraudulent behavior alleged is based on the first cause of action for intentional misrepresentation, the demurrer to which the court has sustained. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e).)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s second cause of action for violation of California’s unfair competition law on the ground that it is uncertain because Plaintiff attributes the wrongful conduct to “Landlord,” which is an undefined term in the Complaint and therefore renders it ambiguous as to which defendant Plaintiff is referencing. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (f).) The court notes that the Complaint makes reference to Exhibits A and B, which are purportedly attached to the Complaint, and which may define the term “Landlord.” (See Compl., 9.) However, there are no exhibits attached to the Complaint as filed with the court to clarify this ambiguity.

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s third cause of action for breach of contract on the ground that it is uncertain because it is ambiguous and unintelligible since (1) Plaintiff alleges that “Landlord” is the person or entity that breached the described duties and contractual responsibilities, but “Landlord” has not been defined in the Complaint, and (2) Plaintiff’s cause of action is captioned as a breach of contract cause of action, but is supported by allegations that the landlord breached a duty to act and therefore sounds in negligence. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (f).)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s fourth cause of action for intentional interference with prospective business advantage on the ground that it fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action since Plaintiff fails to allege the existence of an economic relationship that contains the probability of future economic benefit to Plaintiff, and instead alleges that potential clients have opted not to use Plaintiff’s services (Compl., 48). (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e); Roy Allan Slurry Seal, Inc. v. American Asphalt South, Inc. (2017) 2 Cal.5th 505, 512, 517-518 [this tort “‘presuppose[s] the relationship existed at the time of the defendant’s allegedly tortious acts lest liability be imposed for actually and intentionally disrupting a relationship which has yet to arise”’].)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s fourth cause of action for intentional interference with prospective business advantage on the ground that it is uncertain because Plaintiff has attributed the wrongful behavior to “Landlords,” which is an undefined term in the Complaint and therefore renders the cause of action ambiguous or unintelligible for the reasons set forth above. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (f).)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s fifth cause of action for intentional interference with contractual relations on the ground that it fails to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action since Plaintiff did not allege that Defendants had knowledge of the contractual relationships with which Plaintiff alleges Defendants were interfering. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e); Jenni Rivera Enterprises, LLC v. Latin World Entertainment Holdings, Inc. (2019) 36 Cal.App.5th 766, 782 [the defendant must have knowledge of the contract with which he is interfering].)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s fifth cause of action for intentional interference with contractual relations on the ground that it is uncertain because Plaintiff has only alleged that “Landlord” engaged in the wrongful conduct which interfered with Plaintiff’s contractual relations, but has not defined the term “Landlord.” Plaintiff’s fifth cause of action is therefore ambiguous and unintelligible because it cannot be determined from the allegations which person or entity was acting as the landlord and caused Plaintiff harm. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (f).)

The court overrules Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s sixth cause of action for nuisance on the ground that it states facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action since Plaintiff has alleged a substantial and unreasonable interference with Plaintiff’s property based on the lack of heat and air conditioning. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e).)

The court sustains Gold Aesthetic’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s sixth cause of action for nuisance on the ground that it is uncertain because Plaintiff has only alleged that “Landlords” created the nuisance, but has not defined the term in the Complaint, making it ambiguous and unintelligible. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (f).)

MOTION TO STRIKE

Defendants move the court for an order striking (1) Plaintiff’s claim for punitive and exemplary damages; (2) Plaintiff’s claim for attorney’s fees; and (3) Plaintiff’s claim for restitution and injunctive relief.

The court denies as moot Defendants’ motion to strike Plaintiff’s claims for punitive damages, attorney’s fees, injunctive relief, and restitution because the court has sustained Defendants’ demurrer to each cause of action.

ORDER

The court sustains defendants Oren Gold, Nataly Gold, and Gold Aesthetic, Inc.’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s first through sixth causes of action. (Code Civ. Proc., 430.10, subd. (e), (f).)

The court denies as moot defendants Oren Gold, Nataly Gold, and Gold Aesthetic, Inc.’s motion to strike.

The court grants plaintiff Micro Art, Inc. 20 days leave to file a First Amended Complaint to amend its first through sixth causes of action.

The court directs defendants Oren Gold, Nataly Gold, and Gold Aesthetic, Inc. to give notice of this order.

IT IS SO ORDERED.

DATED: July 26, 2022

Robert B. Broadbelt III

Judge of the Superior Court