This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2019 at 09:33:34 (UTC).

MICHELLE YVETTE WILSON VS MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

Case Summary

On 12/04/2018 MICHELLE YVETTE WILSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7138

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON MICHELLE YVETTE

Defendant

MODA TRANSPORTATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAIME VICTOR H

Defendant Attorney

PUTTERMAN MATHIEU H

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/4/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/4/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/4/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/4/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Mail

6/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Demand for Jury Trial

6/4/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Dismissal

9/27/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michelle Yvette Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Moda Transportation LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Moda Transportation LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Moda Transportation LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michelle Yvette Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Michelle Yvette Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Yvette Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Yvette Wilson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less