This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2023 at 04:56:58 (UTC).

MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG VS RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4500

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANG MICHELLE XIUMEI

Defendant

SHUI RACHEL JUAI CHING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HSU ROGER C.

Defendant Attorney

BORSUTZKI CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

12/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

12/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

11/28/2022: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Notice of Ruling

11/10/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

10/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration of Mailing

10/10/2022: Declaration of Mailing

Proof of Publication

10/10/2022: Proof of Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RACHEL

9/6/2022: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR RACHEL

Application for Publication

8/26/2022: Application for Publication

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROGER C. HSU

7/26/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROGER C. HSU

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADINGS AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/27/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADINGS AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

6/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...) OF 06/29/2022

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...) OF 06/29/2022

Case Management Statement

7/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/2/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Hearing01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff); As to: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff); As to: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff); As to: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff); As to: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MICHELLE XIUMEI WANG (Plaintiff); As to: RACHEL JUAI CHING SHUI (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HSU ROGER C.