This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2022 at 13:59:45 (UTC).

MICHELLE STEWART VS PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 MICHELLE STEWART filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL C. KELLEY and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0322

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART MICHELLE

Defendant

PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SERRAO JOHN-PAUL ANTHONY

Defendant Attorney

FREISTEDT CHRISTOPHER M.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DATES

4/19/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND TRIAL RELATED DATES

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/3/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

1/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/28/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/28/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

1/28/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Demand for Jury Trial

1/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

1/28/2022: Answer

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/20/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

1/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/10/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/12/2022: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMANDA K. CRAWLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMANDA K. CRAWLEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION DBA PALMDALE MEDICAL CENTER'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/17/2021: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/4/2021: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2024
  • Hearing04/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • Hearing10/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for Continuance of Trial and Trial Related Dates); Filed by LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Michelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Service); Filed by LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Trial Counsel); Filed by LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LANCASTER HOSPITAL CORPORATION Erroneously Sued As Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Michelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lodging (in Support of Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Danielle C. Hicks in Support of Defendant Lancaster Hospital Corporation DBA Palmdale Regional Medical Center's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Palmdale Regional Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michelle Stewart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALMDALE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SERRAO, JOHN-PAUL