This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2022 at 22:32:42 (UTC).

MICHELLE SHANDEZ SHAFFER VS DERRICK REESE HAMPTON

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 MICHELLE SHANDEZ SHAFFER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DERRICK REESE HAMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2566

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAFFER MICHELLE SHANDEZ

Defendant

HAMPTON DERRICK REESE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAFFER DOUGLAS DURAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/26/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/14/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 02/23/2022

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-JURY TRIAL) OF 02/23/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Jury Trial) of 02/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Shandez Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Shandez Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michelle Shandez Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Shandez Shaffer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAFFER DOUGLAS D.