This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2023 at 20:35:31 (UTC).

MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ VS ROSE HILLS MORTUARY, L.P.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ROSE HILLS MORTUARY, L P. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1939

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ MICHELLE

Defendants

ROSE HILLS MORTUARY L.P.

DOE FRANCISCO

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. DOE 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOOD SCOTT M.

Defendant Attorneys

JONES MATTHEW S.

DOTY ANDREW KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/29/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/29/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/9/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/14/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/7/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

1/17/2023: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/23/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/15/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/15/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

8/15/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2024
  • Hearing09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2024
  • Hearing03/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. (DOE 2) (Defendant); As to: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. (DOE 2) (Defendant); Service Date: 07/17/2023; Service Cost: 126.35; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2023
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Brightview Landscape Services, Inc. (DOE 2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rose Hills Mortuary, L.P. (Defendant); As to: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Francisco Doe (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/05/2022; Service Cost: 114.15; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Rose Hills Mortuary, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michelle Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Rose Hills Mortuary, L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less