This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 20:23:48 (UTC).

MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS DANIEL VILLALUVUZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL VILLALUVUZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5058

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MICHELLE

Defendants

MARTINEZ AN INDIVIDUAL FRANCIA

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

VILLALUVUZ AN INDIVIDUAL DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROFAEL JOHN R.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/13/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHELLE RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROFAEL JOHN R.