This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:05:04 (UTC).

MICHELLE POWERS VS TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 MICHELLE POWERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TARGET CORPORATION, A MINNESOTA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2555

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

POWERS MICHELLE

Defendant

TARGET CORPORATION A MINNESOTA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS PATRICK

Defendant Attorney

EGAN EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6/17/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/16/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/24/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/13/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2024
  • Hearing06/12/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • Hearing12/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Target Corporation, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Target Corporation, a Minnesota Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Powers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michelle Powers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Powers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EGAN EUGENE J. ESQ.