This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2019 at 07:13:28 (UTC).

MICHELLE PAK CHO VS BENJAMIN SONG MD

Case Summary

On 11/15/2017 MICHELLE PAK CHO filed an Other lawsuit against BENJAMIN SONG MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3575

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHO MICHELLE PAK

Defendants and Respondents

SONG BENJAMIN M.D.

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WOLF JEFFREY D. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

4/2/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/5/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/1/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Proof of Service by Mail

5/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown

5/1/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

12/12/2017: Unknown

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/27/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 597.5)

12/27/2017: DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE ? 597.5)

SUMMONS

11/15/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

11/15/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 05/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by BENJAMIN M.D. SONG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by BENJAMIN M.D. SONG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by BENJAMIN M.D. SONG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by BENJAMIN M.D. SONG (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DEMAND THAT DEFENSE OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS BE TRIED SEPARATELY (CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 597.5)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Proof of Service Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MICHELLE PAK CHO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC683575    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 2

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 2 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE T. GREEN presiding in Department 14 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.