Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/10/2019 at 00:05:48 (UTC).

MICHELLE MENDEZ VS THE KROGER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 MICHELLE MENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7305

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MENDEZ MICHELLE

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

THE KROGER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WRIGHT TIM D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Answer

1/15/2019: Answer

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

2/22/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Notice

3/6/2019: Notice

Unknown

9/25/2017: Unknown

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. GENERAL NKGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

9/25/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. GENERAL NKGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

SUMMONS

9/25/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference and Trial); Filed by ALPHA BETA COMPANY dba FOOD 4 LESS Erroneously Sued As THE KROGER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District) (-FSC:9-13-19 Trial:9-25-19); Filed by ALPHA BETA COMPANY dba FOOD 4 LESS Erroneously Sued As THE KROGER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Answer (of Alpha Beta Company dba Food 4 Less to complaint; demand for jury trial); Filed by ALPHA BETA COMPANY dba FOOD 4 LESS Erroneously Sued As THE KROGER COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MICHELLE MENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. GENERAL NKGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC677305    Hearing Date: December 04, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

MICHELLE MENDEZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

THE KROGER COMPANY,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC677305

Hearing Date: December 4, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to be relieved as counsel

Attorney Tim D. Wright (“Counsel”) moves to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff Michelle Mendez (“Plaintiff”). Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court a copy of the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for this motion is that communication between Counsel and Plaintiff has broken down, which constitutes good cause.

Based upon the foregoing, the Court grants the motion to relieve Tim D. Wright as counsel. Laura Y. Moreno did not file a motion to be relieved, so she shall remain counsel-of-record for Plaintiff until she does so. Although Ms. Moreno filed a declaration, the motion filed by Mr. Wright does not include her. Therefore, the Court cannot relieve her, as there has been improper notice to the parties. This order is without prejudice to Ms. Moreno filing her own motion to be relieved.

The Court orders Counsel to serve a copy of this order, as well as a copy of the Court’s order on Form MC-053, upon all parties, including Plaintiff and Ms. Moreno, within ten (10) days. The Court orders Counsel to file proof of service within twenty (20) days. Counsel shall remain counsel-of-record until the Court’s orders are served and he files proof of service with the Court. Counsel shall provide notice.

DATED: December 4, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'ORO FRANK J. ESQ.