This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2022 at 10:53:18 (UTC).

MICHELLE KELLY VS DEL AMO FASHION CENTER

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 MICHELLE KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DEL AMO FASHION CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1311

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY MICHELLE

Defendants

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER

DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WISEMAN ALFRED J.

Defendant Attorney

PELLETIER STEPHEN T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/18/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

9/9/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

9/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/23/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Answer

1/12/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/27/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/9/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

7/25/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/02/2022

6/2/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 06/02/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

6/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

5/31/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Settlement

5/31/2022: Notice of Settlement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Docketat 5:46 PM in Department 31; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 06/02/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Alfred J. Wiseman (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DEL AMO FASHION CENTER OPERATING COMPANY, LLC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michelle Kelly (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less