This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2022 at 09:49:00 (UTC).

MICHELLE CHICO VS MINIMED DISTRIBUTION CORP., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 MICHELLE CHICO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against MINIMED DISTRIBUTION CORP . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1116

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICO MICHELLE

Defendants

MEDTRONIC INC.

MINIMED DISTRIBUTION CORP.

MONARREZ JUDY

ROD APRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTARAN GHAZALEH

KINGERY NATHAN

Defendant Attorneys

DARROW TANJA

SALEH KRYSTAL ANN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/8/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/3/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 30, 2022

1/26/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 30, 2022

Case Management Statement

3/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/10/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2023
  • Hearing12/05/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2023
  • Hearing11/28/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Minimed Distribution Corp. (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc. (Defendant); April Rod (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Minimed Distribution Corp. (Defendant); Medtronic, Inc. (Defendant); April Rod (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 30, 2022); Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michelle Chico (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MiniMed Distribution Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALEH KRYSTAL ANN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DARROW TANJA LAVONNE