Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 12:48:49 (UTC).

MICHELE LYNN ARNAL VS PHILIP COOK

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 MICHELE LYNN ARNAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PHILIP COOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARNAL MICHELE LYNN

Defendant

COOK PHILIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

PERRY ARIELLA

Other Attorneys

BOVE BROOKE

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/3/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/3/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/8/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

PI General Order

11/12/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

11/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/19/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/19/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2023
  • Hearing10/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • Hearing04/04/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Philip Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Philip Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michele Lynn Arnal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michele Lynn Arnal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michele Lynn Arnal (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less