This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2021 at 12:25:51 (UTC).

MICHELE COHEN VS ELISE SHANFELD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 MICHELE COHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ELISE SHANFELD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8418

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COHEN MICHELE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

SHANFELD ELISE

GUERRERO CHRISTIAN DEREK

Defendant and Cross Defendant

GUERRERO CHRISTIAN DEREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARZBAN MICHAEL M.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HILL GEOFFREY

HURLEY BETH

Cross Defendant Attorney

KIRSCHEN LEONARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2023
  • Hearing12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Hearing06/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Hearing06/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJudgment ([Proposed] Judgement); Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Acceptance of Offer to Compromise); Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elise Shanfeld (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Christian Derek Guerrero (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christian Derek Guerrero (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Elise Shanfeld (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Christian Derek Guerrero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Christian Derek Guerrero (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michele Cohen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARZBAN MICHAEL M.