This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 02:40:08 (UTC).

MICHAL SOPOR VS SKYE HOKULANI NIELSON

Case Summary

On 01/24/2017 MICHAL SOPOR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SKYE HOKULANI NIELSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3142

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOPOR MICHAL

Respondent

NIELSON SKYE HOKULANI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 2A, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Mail + Certified Mail Receipt - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sopor, Michal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 05-04-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Milestone 1 Completed (Entered Date: 05-11-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sopor, Michal - Granted on 2017-01-24 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sopor, Michal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sopor, Michal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • Petition (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Sopor, Michal ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less