This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2021 at 15:58:07 (UTC).

MICHAELIAN, STEPHANIE A. VS MKHITARIAN, HACOB J.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 MICHAELIAN, STEPHANIE A filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MKHITARIAN, HACOB J. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3297

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAELIAN STEPHANIE A.

Respondent

MKHITARIAN HACOB J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARSEGIAN ANAHID

Respondent Attorney

OKHOVAT AIDIN

 

Court Documents

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

5/24/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

6/16/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

3/25/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

3/25/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

3/25/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/28/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

3/29/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

3/29/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OKHOVAT AIDIN