Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2019 at 08:37:02 (UTC).

MICHAEL WEIST III VS MICHAEL BARONE III

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 MICHAEL WEIST III filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MICHAEL BARONE III. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8372

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEIST III MICHAEL

Defendants

BARONE III MICAHEL

HALL BRYCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPLAN JESSE A.

Defendant Attorney

TRAUBEN MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/20/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

2/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

2/15/2018: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

3/5/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

Summons

11/13/2017: Summons

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/17/2018: Minute Order

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/18/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/13/2018: Unknown

Complaint

11/13/2017: Complaint

Unknown

1/17/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/24/2018: Unknown

Order

8/2/2018: Order

Unknown

3/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

8/1/2018: Unknown

Unknown

2/15/2018: Unknown

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department WEM, Mitchell L. Beckloff, Presiding; Conference-Case Management (STATUS OF SETTLEMENT) - Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-02 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Order ( (SIGNED BY JUDGE MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF) ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • Order; Filed by III, MICHAEL WEIST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice (TO REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 664.6 AND FOR DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice; Filed by III, MICHAEL WEIST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Notice; Filed by III, MICAHEL BARONE (Defendant); BRYCE HALL (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Notice (OF COURT ORDERS RE EXTENSIONS OF TIME ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2018
  • Notice (OF ERRATA RE: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by III, MICHAEL WEIST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by III, MICHAEL WEIST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by III, MICHAEL WEIST (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less