Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 23:57:10 (UTC).

MICHAEL TIMOTHY DURAN VS CITY OF WEST COVINA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/03/2020 MICHAEL TIMOTHY DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6201

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DURAN MICHAEL TIMOTHY

Defendants

QUEZADA CHRIS

PAPARRO IAN

WEST COVINA POLICE DEPARTMENT

CITY OF WEST COVINA

CHIEF OF POLICE RICHARD BELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARKS LAWRENCE D.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/3/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2023
  • Hearing11/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • Hearing06/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Hearing05/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Timothy Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Timothy Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Timothy Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA POLICE DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF WEST COVINA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKS LAWRENCE D.