This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 03:45:44 (UTC).

MICHAEL SWINIUCH VS HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 MICHAEL SWINIUCH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5420

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SWINIUCH MICHAEL

Respondents and Defendants

SHU CHAI MEI CHENG

DOES 1 TO 20

HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL LLC

SHU CHUN H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

JANFAZA IIAN N. ROSEN LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

12/4/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY; ETC

12/4/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY; ETC

Unknown

12/4/2017: Unknown

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. BATTERY; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHAEL SWINIUCH (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5420    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 29

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the CENTRAL DISTRICT, LOS ANGELES, JUDGE S. BOWICK presiding in Department 19 for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD 7 STAR MOTEL is a litigant