This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 18:11:48 (UTC).

MICHAEL STEPHEN LEE VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 MICHAEL STEPHEN LEE filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8248

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE MICHAEL STEPHEN

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2006-HES MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2006-IIE8

NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATION

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CARA TONY

CARA ANTHONY P.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Stephen Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA TONY