This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 11:50:33 (UTC).

MICHAEL SAUL GRUSKOFF VS FOUR SEASONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 MICHAEL SAUL GRUSKOFF filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOUR SEASONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1944

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRUSKOFF MICHAEL SAUL

Defendant

FOUR SEASONS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON BRIAN S.

Defendant Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG L.

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/28/2021: Answer

PI General Order

4/16/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Four Seasons Homeowners Association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Saul Gruskoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Saul Gruskoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Saul Gruskoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Saul Gruskoff (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NELSON BRIAN S.