This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2022 at 08:25:52 (UTC).

MICHAEL SANGTHONGKUM, , ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 MICHAEL SANGTHONGKUM, , filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1516

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANGTHONGKUM MICHELLE

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGLETON GERALD

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/27/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/05/2022

10/5/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/05/2022

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (FRANCHELLE SANGTHONGKUM)

10/6/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (FRANCHELLE SANGTHONGKUM)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MICHAEL SANGTHONGKUM)

10/6/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (MICHAEL SANGTHONGKUM)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (FRANCINE SANGTHONGKUM)

10/6/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM (FRANCINE SANGTHONGKUM)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/3/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

11/18/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Order re Complex Determination; Filed by: Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Michelle Sangthongkum (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Michelle Sangthongkum (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); As to: Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Francine Sangthongkum); Signed and Filed by: Michelle Sangthongkum (Non-Party); As to: Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Francine Sangthongkum): Filed By: Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Michael Sangthongkum); Signed and Filed by: Michelle Sangthongkum (Non-Party); As to: Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Michael Sangthongkum): Filed By: Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Franchelle Sangthongkum); Signed and Filed by: Michelle Sangthongkum (Non-Party); As to: Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Franchelle Sangthongkum): Filed By: Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff),Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 10 - Hon. William F. Highberger; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 10/05/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Michael Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Franchelle Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francheska Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); Francine Sangthongkum, (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant