This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2020 at 09:56:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL RIVES VS DEAN C. LOGAN, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS LOS ANGELES COUNTY REGISTRAR-RECORDER/COUNTY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 MICHAEL RIVES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against DEAN C LOGAN, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS LOS ANGELES COUNTY REGISTRAR-RECORDER/COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES C. CHALFANT. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5441

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAMES C. CHALFANT

 

Party Details

Petitioners

RIVES MICHAEL

ENGLANDER ADAM

Respondents

THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

LOGAN DEAN C. IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS LOS ANGELES COUNTY REGISTRAR-RECORDER/COUNTY CLERK

THE ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

Interested Parties

ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DONOVAN WILLIAM P. JR.

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

GIRGADO RICHARD ENRIQUE

PENNINGTON ELIZABETH

OCHOA ADRIANA RAQUEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - THE PETITIONERS' PRAYER FOR RELIEF

2/27/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - THE PETITIONERS' PRAYER FOR RELIEF

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

2/27/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Request for Judicial Notice

2/27/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN THE COUNTY COUNSEL'S OFFICE

2/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN THE COUNTY COUNSEL'S OFFICE

Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF BROWN ACT, PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND ELECTI

2/28/2020: Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF BROWN ACT, PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND ELECTI

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/6/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF CALIFORNIA'S RALPH M. BROWN ACT, THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC R

1/29/2020: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF CALIFORNIA'S RALPH M. BROWN ACT, THE CALIFORNIA PUBLIC R

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIVES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

12/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL RIVES IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S EX PARTE APPLICATION

Response - RESPONSE OF DEAN LOGAN TO EX PARTE APPLICATION; DECLARATION OF AMAN BHULLAR

12/19/2019: Response - RESPONSE OF DEAN LOGAN TO EX PARTE APPLICATION; DECLARATION OF AMAN BHULLAR

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/19/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILLIAM P. DONOVAN, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S EX PARTE

12/19/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF WILLIAM P. DONOVAN, JR. IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S EX PARTE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER FOR ISSUANCE OF...)

12/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PETITIONER FOR ISSUANCE OF...)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (the Petitioners' Prayer for Relief) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner); Adam Englander (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketResponse to Petition (ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATIONS OF BROWN ACT, PUBLIC RECORDS ACT AND ELECTIONS CODE); Filed by the Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent); the Board of Directors of Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Dean C. Logan, , in his official capacity as Los Angeles County Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Attorney Within The County Counsel's Office); Filed by Dean C. Logan, , in his official capacity as Los Angeles County Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by Dean C. Logan, , in his official capacity as Los Angeles County Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Adriana Ochoa in Support of Opposition to Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Alternative Writ of Mandate); Filed by the Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent); the Board of Directors of Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOpposition (Opposition to Ex Parte); Filed by the Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent); the Board of Directors of Antelope Valley Healthcare District (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Michael Rives in support of Petitioner's Ex Parte Application); Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketResponse (Of Dean Logan To Ex Parte Application; Declaration Of Aman Bhullar); Filed by Dean C. Logan, , in his official capacity as Los Angeles County Registrar-Recorder/County Clerk (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of William P. Donovan, Jr. in support of Petitioner's Ex Parte); Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketPetition (Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate); Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Michael Rives (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adriana Raquel Ochoa