This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/16/2021 at 17:38:00 (UTC).

MICHAEL RIDEAUX VS DEL RIO LANES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 MICHAEL RIDEAUX filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEL RIO LANES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3625

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIDEAUX MICHAEL

Defendants

CAMARATA MICHAEL

DEL RIO LANES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGRIN DEAN

Defendant Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG L.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/25/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

4/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

4/21/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/9/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2024
  • Hearing04/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • Hearing10/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • Hearing09/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Del Rio Lanes, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Michael Cammarata Erroneously Sued As Michael Camarata (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Dean Ogrin (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Rideaux (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGRIN DEAN