This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:26:08 (UTC).

MICHAEL RICHARDSON VS THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 MICHAEL RICHARDSON filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0594

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARDSON MICHAEL

Defendants

GONZALEZ ANDY

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

TORRES JOSE

VIRGENES ERNESTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UNANYAN KRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/1/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Richardson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Richardson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Richardson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer UNANYAN KRISTINA