Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/29/2019 at 12:48:29 (UTC).

MICHAEL RHINE, ET AL. VS KENNY C. VOONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/15/2019 MICHAEL RHINE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KENNY C VOONG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9069

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ROMERO JASON

RHINE MICHAEL

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

VOONG KENNY C.

LOERA JUAN A.

ALVA ROXANA Y.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESAROS CHRISTOPHER P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

CHUN ARANG

AVAKIAN ARMEN A.

CHEREN DANIEL J.

TADDESSE RAEET D.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/18/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/18/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

11/8/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/8/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/8/2019: Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint

11/13/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/13/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

11/14/2019: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction

Demand for Jury Trial

11/8/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/8/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PI General Order

8/29/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/15/2019: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • Hearing08/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Hearing02/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Hearing01/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kenny C. Voong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kenny C. Voong (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Juan A. Loera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Juan A. Loera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Roxana Y. Alva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Roxana Y. Alva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Roxana Y. Alva (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff); Jason Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff); Jason Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Rhine (Plaintiff); Jason Romero (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEREN DANIEL J