Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2021 at 15:13:01 (UTC).

MICHAEL PIN, ET AL. VS CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 MICHAEL PIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA CLARITA, A GOVERNMENT ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9071

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PIN LORI

PIN MICHAEL

Defendants

CITY OF SANTA CLARITA A GOVERNMENT ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES GOVERNMENT ENTITY

BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDZANT BARRY L.

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Pin (Plaintiff); Lori Pin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Pin (Plaintiff); Lori Pin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Pin (Plaintiff); Lori Pin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Pin (Plaintiff); Lori Pin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPE SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SANTA CLARITA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDZANT, BARRY L