Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 00:42:48 (UTC).

MICHAEL PAYNE ET AL VS CITY NATIONAL BANK NA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/29/2017 MICHAEL PAYNE filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against CITY NATIONAL BANK NA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5806

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

PAYNE MICHAEL

WILINSKY THOMAS B.

JEFFREY ALAN

GREEN STEPHEN

BAKOS LASZLO HUGO

ROWACK RICHARD

Defendants and Respondents

FITZWILLIAM PATRICK BRIAN

CITY NATIONAL BANK N.A.

Other

KEITH A. FINK & ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NUNEZ STEVEN M. ESQ.

GALANTER DOUGLAS FOSTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MCKOOL SMITH HENNIGAN P.C.

BLECHER & COLLINS LAW OFFICES OF

RAINES FELDMAN LLP

SWARTZ MICHAEL HOWARD

KEITH A. FINK & ASSOCIATES

IRVING JEANNE ELLEN

 

Court Documents

Status Report

3/12/2018: Status Report

Order

3/21/2018: Order

Minute Order

5/3/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

7/30/2018: Declaration

Declaration

7/30/2018: Declaration

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

9/5/2018: Notice of Ruling

Declaration

12/3/2018: Declaration

Objection

12/17/2018: Objection

Declaration

1/10/2019: Declaration

Notice

1/10/2019: Notice

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Stipulation and Order

1/9/2018: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation - No Order

11/3/2017: Stipulation - No Order

Minute Order

5/9/2017: Minute Order

Minute Order

7/6/2017: Minute Order

Order

7/6/2017: Order

Minute Order

8/31/2017: Minute Order

130 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • Hearingat 16:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Hearingat 09:00 AM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docketat 11:30 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Final Approval of Settlement - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees (and costs) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
266 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case BC624542-CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case BC636780-CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case BC634385-CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case BC641712-CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case BC606667-CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case CITY NATIONAL BANK'S NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by City National Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Laszlo Hugo Bakos (Plaintiff); Stephen Green (Plaintiff); Alan Jeffrey (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketCLASS ACTION COMPLAINT COUNTS: 1. AIDING AND ABETTING FRAUD; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEITH A. FINK & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NUNEZ STEVEN