This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 00:10:52 (UTC).

MICHAEL PAUL AGUILAR VS BICYCLE HOTEL & CASINO ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/13/2017 MICHAEL PAUL AGUILAR filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BICYCLE HOTEL CASINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6983

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AGUILAR MICHAEL PAUL

Defendants and Respondents

ESMAILL ZACK

TIAN JOHN

BICYCLE CASINO LP

BICYCLE HOTEL & CASINO

BICYCLE CASINO INC. THE

DOES 1-100

RAHME GEORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHEGERIAN & ASSOCIATES INC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ARENT FOX LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/17/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/27/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Unknown

2/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

2/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

2/27/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/2/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Unknown

3/2/2017: Unknown

Unknown

3/23/2017: Unknown

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P., ZACK ESMAILI, GEORGE RAHME AND JOHN TIAN TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PAUL AGUILAR'S COMPLAINT

3/27/2017: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS THE BICYCLE CASINO, L.P., ZACK ESMAILI, GEORGE RAHME AND JOHN TIAN TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PAUL AGUILAR'S COMPLAINT

Unknown

3/27/2017: Unknown

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

3/28/2017: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Unknown

4/3/2017: Unknown

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE

4/3/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUANCE

JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/20/2017: JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

MINUTE ORDER

5/1/2017: MINUTE ORDER

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

8/28/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/12/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 51; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Michael Paul Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Michael Paul Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 51; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Order-Protective; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Michael Paul Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Michael Paul Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PAUL AGUILAR'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) DISCRIMINATION ON THE BASIS OF AGE IN VIOLATION OF FEHA;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Michael Paul Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BICYCLE HOTEL AND CASINO is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BICYCLE CASINO A PARTNERSHIP is a litigant