Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 12:03:41 (UTC).

MICHAEL PAINE, AN INDIVIDUAL VS MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 MICHAEL PAINE, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9578

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAINE AN INDIVIDUAL MICHAEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA INC. A CORPORATION

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY A CORPORATION

RODRIGUEZ AN INDIVIDUAL MIGUEL

DUCKETT-WILSON DEVELOPMENT COMPANY

U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC.

SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION

STANTON CAPITAL LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANISH BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FERRANTE DAVID MICHAEL

Cross Defendant Attorney

JENKINS MICHAEL EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

4/15/2020: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/24/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/24/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION & ORDER TO DISMISS MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ FROM ACTION

5/6/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION & ORDER TO DISMISS MIGUEL RODRIGUEZ FROM ACTION

Proof of Personal Service

5/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

6/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

6/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE (NOT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT)

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER OF RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA FOOD 4 LESS TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/23/2019: Answer - ANSWER OF RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY DBA FOOD 4 LESS TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

3/27/2019: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Hearing06/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Hearing06/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As Ralphs Grocery Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As Ralphs Grocery Company, a corporation (Cross-Defendant); Miguel Rodriguez, an individual (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Safco Capital Corporation (Cross-Complainant); Stanton Capital, LP (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Stanton Capital, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Safco Capital Corporation (Defendant); Stanton Capital, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer (Of Ralphs Grocery Company DBA Food 4 Less To Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial); Filed by Ralphs Grocery Company dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As Ralphs Grocery Company, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Paine, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAFCO CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DUCKETT-WILSON DEVELOPMENT COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. SECURITY ASSOCIATES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant