This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2019 at 12:02:06 (UTC).

MICHAEL ORTEGA VS FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 MICHAEL ORTEGA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5630

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ORTEGA MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

RODRIGUEZ SERGIO JR.

FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

STEINBERG PETER M. ESQ.

STEINBERG PETER MARION ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

DIAMOND PETER KEVIN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

12/5/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

12/5/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/19/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/19/2018: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

DECLARATION OF MAILING

1/19/2018: DECLARATION OF MAILING

Minute Order

5/20/2019: Minute Order

Stipulation and Order

5/20/2019: Stipulation and Order

Unknown

5/20/2019: Unknown

Stipulation and Order

5/14/2019: Stipulation and Order

Unknown

1/16/2019: Unknown

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF MAILING

2/16/2018: DECLARATION OF MAILING

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. AND SERGIO RODRIGUEZ, JR.; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2/9/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, INC. AND SERGIO RODRIGUEZ, JR.; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 12:13 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Related Case Filed 06/26/20...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Pursuant to Notice of Related Case Filed 06/26/20...) of 05/20/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (To Consolidate.....DENIED.....address consolidation request my noticed motion); Filed by FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)); Filed by MICHAEL ORTEGA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Continue Trial); Filed by FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC (Defendant); SERGIO JR. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by FRESH AIR ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES INC (Defendant); SERGIO JR. RODRIGUEZ (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by MICHAEL ORTEGA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MICHAEL ORTEGA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by MICHAEL ORTEGA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MICHAEL ORTEGA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5630    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 2

Ortega v. Fresh Air Environmental Services, Inc., et al.

Defendants’ Motion for Order Consolidating Actions filed on 11/5/2019 is GRANTED.

The Court has previously deemed the following cases related: Ortega v. Fresh Air Environmental Services, Inc., Case No. ****5630; Arcand v. Fresh Air Environmental Services, Inc., et al, Case No. BC697281; and Flores v. Fresh Air Environmental Services, et al., Case No. BC716871.

Defendants now move to consolidate them. Consolidation is appropriate because all cases arise from the same accident, involve substantially the same parties, and common questions of law or fact are pending. Thus, consolidation will avoid the risk of inconsistent judgments. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. ; 1048(a). bc685630

Moving party is ordered to give notice.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fresh Air Environmental Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAMOND PETER K.