This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 16:56:54 (UTC).

MICHAEL ONEIL VS LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP., A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 MICHAEL ONEIL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP , A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8605

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEIL MICHAEL

Defendants

DOES 1-20 INCLUSIVE

DOE SYLVESTER

LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP. A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGLOTHLIN DAVID J. ESQ.

WU JOHN D. ESQ.

ADAMSKY LAWRENCE P.

Defendant Attorneys

DEAM AYA J.

JOSHI DINESH ASHWIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/18/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/26/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/7/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/25/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2022
  • Hearing12/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Lily Transportation Corp., a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Michael Oneil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Lily Transportation Corp., a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Lily Transportation Corp., a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Michael Oneil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Michael Oneil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Michael Oneil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Michael Oneil (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LILY TRANSPORTATION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WU JOHN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADAMSKY LAWRENCE P. LAW OFFICES OF

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGLOTHLIN DAVID J. ESQ.